THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:45:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: JMF's A.C.P.M. Medical College, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Bayly Street West
Unit 4 & 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 612-1234
Fax: (289) 372-0202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. KAZI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kazi (CPSO#: 140497 )
Business Address: 360 Bayly Street West
Unit 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
2896121234

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: JMF's A.C.P.M. Medical College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Bayly Street West
Unit 4 & 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 612-1234
Fax: (289) 372-0202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. KAZI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kazi (CPSO#: 140497 )
Business Address: 360 Bayly Street West
Unit 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
2896121234

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIZWAN USMAN KAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIZWAN USMAN KAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: JMF's A.C.P.M. Medical College, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022