THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:57:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 935 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 2C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sebastian Diebel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Diebel (CPSO#: 140581 )
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
705-988-0705

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 935 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON P3E 2C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sebastian Diebel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Diebel (CPSO#: 140581 )
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
705-988-0705

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN RICHARD DIEBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIEBEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEBASTIAN RICHARD DIEBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIEBEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022