THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:22:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Peter Ziccarelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ziccarelli (CPSO#: 140596 )
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T
705-542-8620

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Peter Ziccarelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ziccarelli (CPSO#: 140596 )
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T
705-542-8620

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY PETER ZICCARELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZICCARELLI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY PETER ZICCARELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZICCARELLI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022