THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:11:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: Akerele, OLUWATOYIN Yetunde (Used Until: 22 Apr 2022)
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University College of Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6265 Perth Street
Richmond Medical Clinic
Family medicine
Ottawa Ontario K0A 2Z0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138381223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TOYIN SHONUBI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Shonubi (CPSO#: 140604 )
Business Address: 6138381223
Business Address: 6265 Perth Street
Richmond Medical Clinic
Family medicine
Ottawa Ontario K0A 2Z0
6138381223

General Information

Former Name: Akerele, OLUWATOYIN Yetunde (Used Until: 22 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University College of Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6265 Perth Street
Richmond Medical Clinic
Family medicine
Ottawa Ontario K0A 2Z0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138381223
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TOYIN SHONUBI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Shonubi (CPSO#: 140604 )
Business Address: 6138381223
Business Address: 6265 Perth Street
Richmond Medical Clinic
Family medicine
Ottawa Ontario K0A 2Z0
6138381223

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUWATOYIN OMOLARA SHONUBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHONUBI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUWATOYIN OMOLARA SHONUBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHONUBI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Obafemi Awolowo University College of Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022