THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:43:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Bayly Street West
Unit # 4 & 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2896121234
Fax: 2893720202
Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 2893121234
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malik (CPSO#: 140644 )
Business Address: 58 Fonda Road
Markham Ontario L3S 3X2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Bayly Street West
Unit # 4 & 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2896121234
Fax: 2893720202
Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 2893121234
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Malik (CPSO#: 140644 )
Business Address: 58 Fonda Road
Markham Ontario L3S 3X2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIDRA MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIDRA MALIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022