THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:16:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: Grobler, Corli Evette (Used Until: 24 Apr 2022)
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 52 Saint Lawrence Street East
Madoc Ontario K0K 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134734134
Fax: 6134734740

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Barnes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barnes (CPSO#: 140733 )
Business Address: 52 Saint Lawrence Street East
Madoc Ontario K0K 2K0
6134734134

General Information

Former Name: Grobler, Corli Evette (Used Until: 24 Apr 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 52 Saint Lawrence Street East
Madoc Ontario K0K 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134734134
Fax: 6134734740

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Barnes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barnes (CPSO#: 140733 )
Business Address: 52 Saint Lawrence Street East
Madoc Ontario K0K 2K0
6134734134

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORLI EVETTE BARNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORLI EVETTE BARNES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARNES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022