THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:11:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2015 Bancroft Drive
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3B 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052226337
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Family Medicine
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alessia Pastre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pastre (CPSO#: 140791 )
Business Address: 2015 Bancroft Drive
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3B 1T1
705-222-6337
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 2009 Long Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 522-3380
Business Address: 348 Muskoka Road North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
7057892355
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
705-267-2131

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2015 Bancroft Drive
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3B 1T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7052226337
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Health Sciences North
Family Medicine
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alessia Pastre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pastre (CPSO#: 140791 )
Business Address: 2015 Bancroft Drive
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3B 1T1
705-222-6337
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 523-7100
Business Address: 2009 Long Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 522-3380
Business Address: 348 Muskoka Road North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
7057892355
Business Address: 700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 0A2
705-267-2131

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALESSIA PASTRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALESSIA PASTRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PASTRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022