THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:33:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University, 2022
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6505 Malden Road
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199709280
Fax: 5199709085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JULIA C. PETTA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Petta (CPSO#: 140917 )
Business Address: 6505 Malden Road
6505 Malden Rd
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6505 Malden Road
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5199709280
Fax: 5199709085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JULIA C. PETTA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Petta (CPSO#: 140917 )
Business Address: 6505 Malden Road
6505 Malden Rd
Windsor Ontario N9H 1T5
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA CHRISTINA PETTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA CHRISTINA PETTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022