THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:07:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Western University, 2022
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 338 Herbert Street
Leeds and Grenville Community Family Health Team
Gananoque Ontario K7G 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-382-7383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Western University, 2022

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 338 Herbert Street
Leeds and Grenville Community Family Health Team
Gananoque Ontario K7G 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-382-7383
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK RALEIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RALEIGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK RALEIGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RALEIGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Western University, 2022

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 21 Jul 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022