THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:50:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hamdard College of Medicine & Dentistry, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Bayly Street West
BayWest Medical Centre
Units 4 & 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-612-1234
Fax: 289-372-0202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Adil (CPSO#: 141319 )
Business Address: 360 Bayly Street West
BayWest Medical Centre
Units 4 & 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
289-612-1234

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Hamdard College of Medicine & Dentistry, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Bayly Street West
BayWest Medical Centre
Units 4 & 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-612-1234
Fax: 289-372-0202

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Adil (CPSO#: 141319 )
Business Address: 360 Bayly Street West
BayWest Medical Centre
Units 4 & 5
Ajax Ontario L1S 1P1
289-612-1234

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOOR US SAHAR ADIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOOR US SAHAR ADIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hamdard College of Medicine & Dentistry, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022