THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:23:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Medical Associates
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058733000
Fax: 9058730800
Address: 308 Guelph Street
Alpha Care Medical Center
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 4B1
Phone: 9058772220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AMBREEN JAVED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORP.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Javed (CPSO#: 141324 )
Business Address: 65 Niagara Trail
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 0A7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Medical Associates
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058733000
Fax: 9058730800
Address: 308 Guelph Street
Alpha Care Medical Center
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 4B1
Phone: 9058772220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AMBREEN JAVED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORP.
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Javed (CPSO#: 141324 )
Business Address: 65 Niagara Trail
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 0A7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBREEN JAVED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBREEN JAVED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022