THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:36:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: Jasveen Kaur, _ (Used Until: 15 May 2024) Kaur, Jasveen (Used Until: 25 Apr 2024)
Medical School: Sri Guru Ram Das Institute of Medical Sciences & Research, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 510 Southdale Road East
London Ontario N6E 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 914 5202
Fax: 519 914 5204
Address: 1807 Wonderland Road North
London Ontario N6G 5C2
Phone: 519-433-4300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: Jasveen Kaur, _ (Used Until: 15 May 2024) Kaur, Jasveen (Used Until: 25 Apr 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sri Guru Ram Das Institute of Medical Sciences & Research, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 510 Southdale Road East
London Ontario N6E 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 914 5202
Fax: 519 914 5204
Address: 1807 Wonderland Road North
London Ontario N6G 5C2
Phone: 519-433-4300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASVEEN KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASVEEN KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sri Guru Ram Das Institute of Medical Sciences & Research, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022