THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:55:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Health Sciences, St. Kitts, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Grand Avenue West
Internal Medicine, ICU, PCU Department
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KINZA IJAZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ijaz (CPSO#: 141662 )
Business Address: 167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg ON N4G 3Y9
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
5193526400

Corporation Name: ASAD NAEEM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naeem (CPSO#: 133177 ) Dr. K. Ijaz (CPSO#: 141662 )
Business Address: 80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1B7
(519) 437-6092 Extn: Administrative Assistant, Medical Affairs

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Medicine and Health Sciences, St. Kitts, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Grand Avenue West
Internal Medicine, ICU, PCU Department
Chatham Ontario N7M 5L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: -
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KINZA IJAZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ijaz (CPSO#: 141662 )
Business Address: 167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg ON N4G 3Y9
Business Address: 80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham Ontario N7L 1B7
5193526400

Corporation Name: ASAD NAEEM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naeem (CPSO#: 133177 ) Dr. K. Ijaz (CPSO#: 141662 )
Business Address: 80 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1B7
(519) 437-6092 Extn: Administrative Assistant, Medical Affairs

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KINZA IJAZ may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KINZA IJAZ may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Health Sciences, St. Kitts, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2022