THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:38:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 141 Frederick Campbell Street
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
Fergus Ontario N1M 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West Street
Norfolk General Hospital
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DIANA ABU-MAHFOUZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Abu-Mahfouz (CPSO#: 141720 )
Business Address: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 141 Frederick Campbell Street
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
Fergus Ontario N1M 0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 365 West Street
Norfolk General Hospital
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7
Phone: (519) 426-0130
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DIANA ABU-MAHFOUZ MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Abu-Mahfouz (CPSO#: 141720 )
Business Address: 365 West Street
Simcoe Ontario N3Y 1T7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA ABU-MAHFOUZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU-MAHFOUZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIANA ABU-MAHFOUZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABU-MAHFOUZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2024