THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:05:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Met Campus
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2727 Parliament Ave
Prairie Skies Medical Imaging
Regina SK S4S 6X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. MOUSSA MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moussa (CPSO#: 141802 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Met Campus
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2727 Parliament Ave
Prairie Skies Medical Imaging
Regina SK S4S 6X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette Campus
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 06 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 01 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. MOUSSA MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Moussa (CPSO#: 141802 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMR KHALED SHAWKY MOHAMED MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMR KHALED SHAWKY MOHAMED MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026