THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:43:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118 7th Avenue
Hanover Medical Associates
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hanover & District Hospital
90 7th Ave
Hanover ON N4N 1N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 118 7th Avenue
Hanover Medical Associates
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hanover & District Hospital
90 7th Ave
Hanover ON N4N 1N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 12 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR HAJAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR HAJAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAJAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 12 Aug 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022