THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:50:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: Septimio Lanza, Fernanda (Used Until: 02 Jun 2022)
Medical School: Centro Universitário Serra dos Órgãos (UNIFESO) Centro de Ciências da Saúde, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Rm.M3-200
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: Septimio Lanza, Fernanda (Used Until: 02 Jun 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Centro Universitário Serra dos Órgãos (UNIFESO) Centro de Ciências da Saúde, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Rm.M3-200
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FERNANDA SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FERNANDA SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. SEPTIMIO LANZA OLIVEIRA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Centro Universitário Serra dos Órgãos (UNIFESO) Centro de Ciências da Saúde, 2002
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
02 Aug 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2025 to 01 Aug 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
01 Jul 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
24 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
01 Oct 2022 to 23 Dec 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 02 Aug 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 01 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2025 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 31 Dec 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 31 Dec 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology
DATE: 24 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
DATE: 01 Oct 2022 to 23 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Dec 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Dec 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2022