THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:51:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2295 Bristol Circle
Unit 101
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165778359
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HENDERSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Henderson Berg (CPSO#: 142340 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 2295 Bristol Circle
Unit 101
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
4165778359

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2295 Bristol Circle
Unit 101
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165778359
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HENDERSON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Henderson Berg (CPSO#: 142340 )
Business Address:
Business Address: 2295 Bristol Circle
Unit 101
Oakville Ontario L6H 6P8
4165778359

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEAGAN-HELEN HENDERSON BERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON BERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEAGAN-HELEN HENDERSON BERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDERSON BERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Sep 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 2022