THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:00:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Kinshasa Faculté de Médecine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, AFRIKAANS, LINGALA, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 613 345 5649
Extension: 51300
Fax: 613 345 8308
Address: 1092 107th St
Battlefords union hospital
Internal Medicine
North Battleford SK S9A 1Z1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masimango Kambale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kambale (CPSO#: 142523 )
Business Address: 75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, AFRIKAANS, LINGALA, SWAHILI
Medical School: Université de Kinshasa Faculté de Médecine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 613 345 5649
Extension: 51300
Fax: 613 345 8308
Address: 1092 107th St
Battlefords union hospital
Internal Medicine
North Battleford SK S9A 1Z1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masimango Kambale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kambale (CPSO#: 142523 )
Business Address: 75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASIMANGO KAHINDO KAMBALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMBALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASIMANGO KAHINDO KAMBALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAMBALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Kinshasa Faculté de Médecine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2023