THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C100-11 King St W
MyHealth Centre-Toronto King
Suite c100
Toronto ON M5H 4C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18883148363
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 31 Centre St S
MyHealth Centre- Brampton Centre
Brampton ON L6W 2X7
Phone: 18882860209
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 470 Chrysler Drive
#28
Brampton Ontario L6S 2M3
Phone: 18339044575
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 106-17730 Leslie St
MyHealth Centre Newmarket
Suite 106
Newmarket ON L3Y 3E4
Phone: 18882298122
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 218-1849 Yonge St
MyHealth Centre-Toronto Davisville
Suite 218
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Phone: 18888201608
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arsh Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 142564 )
Business Address: 15 Rolling Green Crt
Kleinburg ON L4H 4K7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C100-11 King St W
MyHealth Centre-Toronto King
Suite c100
Toronto ON M5H 4C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18883148363
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 31 Centre St S
MyHealth Centre- Brampton Centre
Brampton ON L6W 2X7
Phone: 18882860209
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 470 Chrysler Drive
#28
Brampton Ontario L6S 2M3
Phone: 18339044575
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 106-17730 Leslie St
MyHealth Centre Newmarket
Suite 106
Newmarket ON L3Y 3E4
Phone: 18882298122
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 218-1849 Yonge St
MyHealth Centre-Toronto Davisville
Suite 218
Toronto ON M4S 1Y2
Phone: 18888201608
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 14 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arsh Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Oct 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gupta (CPSO#: 142564 )
Business Address: 15 Rolling Green Crt
Kleinburg ON L4H 4K7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARSH RICKI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARSH RICKI GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2022