THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:18:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: Osinuga, Oluyemisi Subuola Olatokunbo (Used Until: 28 Jun 2022)
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 595 Parliment Street
City Family Doctor's Clinic
Toronto Ontario M4X 1PG
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-926-1006
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1901 Younge Street
Davisville Medical Clinic
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y6
Phone: 416-483-0102
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Feb 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR OLUYEMISI OSHUNRINADE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Oshunrinade (CPSO#: 142758 )
Business Address: 1901 Yonge Street
#4
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y8
4164830102

General Information

Former Name: Osinuga, Oluyemisi Subuola Olatokunbo (Used Until: 28 Jun 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 595 Parliment Street
City Family Doctor's Clinic
Toronto Ontario M4X 1PG
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-926-1006
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1901 Younge Street
Davisville Medical Clinic
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y6
Phone: 416-483-0102
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Feb 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR OLUYEMISI OSHUNRINADE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Oshunrinade (CPSO#: 142758 )
Business Address: 1901 Yonge Street
#4
Toronto Ontario M4S 1Y8
4164830102

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUYEMISI SUBUOLA OLATOKUNBO OSHUNRINADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSHUNRINADE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLUYEMISI SUBUOLA OLATOKUNBO OSHUNRINADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSHUNRINADE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2022