THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:23:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 62-1262 Don Mills Rd
Interventional Pain and Spine Specialists of Canada
Toronto ON M3B 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 335-7474
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 24 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pain Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 62-1262 Don Mills Rd
Interventional Pain and Spine Specialists of Canada
Toronto ON M3B 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 335-7474
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 24 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pain Medicine
Effective: 24 Aug 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Nov 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 09 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JARED DAVID McCALLUM may practise medicine independently in Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation and Pain Medicine
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JARED DAVID McCALLUM may practise medicine independently in Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation and Pain Medicine

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Nov 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 23 Aug 2026