THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:21:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9005 Torbram Road
Brampton Ontario L6S 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057923113
Fax: 9057929944
Address: 1-9005 Torbram Rd
Brampton ON L6S 3L2
Phone: 9057923113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marian Jirjis Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jirjis (CPSO#: 143094 )
Business Address: 9005 Torbram Road
Unit A
Brampton Ontario L6S 5X9
9057923113

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9005 Torbram Road
Brampton Ontario L6S 5X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057923113
Fax: 9057929944
Address: 1-9005 Torbram Rd
Brampton ON L6S 3L2
Phone: 9057923113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Sep 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marian Jirjis Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jirjis (CPSO#: 143094 )
Business Address: 9005 Torbram Road
Unit A
Brampton Ontario L6S 5X9
9057923113

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAN JIRJIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIRJIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAN JIRJIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIRJIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Feb 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2023