THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 Jan 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MUSTAFA ABDUL KARIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdul Karim (CPSO#: 143197 )
Business Address: 115 Kintail Cres
London ON N6E 1J4
Business Address: 3611 Lynds St
London ON N6L 0G6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 550 Wellington Rd
London ON N6C 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 02 Jan 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 02 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MUSTAFA ABDUL KARIM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdul Karim (CPSO#: 143197 )
Business Address: 115 Kintail Cres
London ON N6E 1J4
Business Address: 3611 Lynds St
London ON N6L 0G6

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Jan 2023
30 Jun 2028
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 02 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2028
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MUSTAFA ABDUL KARIM may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of General Adult Psychiatry, Western University, in which Dr. ABDUL KARIM holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ABDUL KARIM no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ABDUL KARIM’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ABDUL KARIM’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 02 January, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. ABDUL KARIM's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MUSTAFA ABDUL KARIM may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Psychiatry, Division of General Adult Psychiatry, Western University, in which Dr. ABDUL KARIM holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ABDUL KARIM no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ABDUL KARIM’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ABDUL KARIM’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 02 January, 2023, and expires on 30 June, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. ABDUL KARIM's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Weill Cornell Medical College in Qatar, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2028
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2028

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2023