THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:29:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1276 South Park St
QEII/Victoria General
Department of Hematology
Halifax NS B3H 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: W 12Th-899 12Th Ave W
Vancouver General Hospital
Department of Hematology
Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1276 South Park St
QEII/Victoria General
Department of Hematology
Halifax NS B3H 2Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: W 12Th-899 12Th Ave W
Vancouver General Hospital
Department of Hematology
Vancouver BC V5Z 1M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOMNA KAMAL ABDELHAMID EISSA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. EISSA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. EISSA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EISSA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. EISSA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. EISSA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. EISSA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOMNA KAMAL ABDELHAMID EISSA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. EISSA is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. EISSA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. EISSA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. EISSA shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:
(i) When Dr. EISSA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,
(ii) When Dr. EISSA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or
(iii) When five years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.
NOTE: This certificate expires on 31 December, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
20 Oct 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2025 to 19 Oct 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
10 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2024 to 09 Oct 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
14 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Hematology
22 Nov 2022 to 13 Feb 2023
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 20 Oct 2025 to 31 Dec 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 19 Oct 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 10 Oct 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 09 Oct 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 14 Feb 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Hematology
DATE: 22 Nov 2022 to 13 Feb 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 31 Dec 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 31 Dec 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2022