THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:09:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-431-8165
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Centenary Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-623-1219
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Birchmount Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2506
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. J. CHOU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chou (CPSO#: 143623 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-431-8165
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Centenary Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Phone: 416-623-1219
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Birchmount Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: 416-495-2506
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. J. CHOU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chou (CPSO#: 143623 )
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Ave E
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Rd
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACKIE CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACKIE CHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2022