THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:01:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Health Sciences, St. Kitts, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12 Absalom St E
Mildmay Community Medical Clinic
Mildmay ON N0G 2J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-909-3470
Fax: 226-840-3366

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ellen Lorenzen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lorenzen (CPSO#: 143633 )
Business Address: 12 Absalom Street East
Box 370
Mildmay Ontario N0G 2J0
2269093470

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Medicine and Health Sciences, St. Kitts, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12 Absalom St E
Mildmay Community Medical Clinic
Mildmay ON N0G 2J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-909-3470
Fax: 226-840-3366

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ellen Lorenzen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Lorenzen (CPSO#: 143633 )
Business Address: 12 Absalom Street East
Box 370
Mildmay Ontario N0G 2J0
2269093470

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
05 Jul 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 05 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ELLEN JANE LORENZEN may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ELLEN JANE LORENZEN may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Health Sciences, St. Kitts, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2023