THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:42:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Christian Medical College, Vellore, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Christian Medical College, Vellore, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Christian Medical College, Vellore, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
01 Oct 2024 to 12 Jan 2025
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
15 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Sep 2023
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
25 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
03 Oct 2022 to 24 Dec 2022
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Oct 2024 to 12 Jan 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Sep 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine
DATE: 15 Jan 2024 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 25 Dec 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 03 Oct 2022 to 24 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2022