THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:05:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Behravan, Effat (Used Until: 17 Aug 2022)
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Mashhad Branch Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 277-7163 Yonge Street
Grand Optima Medical Clinic
Markham Ontario L3T 0C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055975125
Fax: 2898070047

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BEHRAVAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Behravan (CPSO#: 143677 )
Business Address: Grand Optima Medical Clinic 9055975125
Business Address: 1-87 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 1M4

General Information

Former Name: Behravan, Effat (Used Until: 17 Aug 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Mashhad Branch Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 277-7163 Yonge Street
Grand Optima Medical Clinic
Markham Ontario L3T 0C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055975125
Fax: 2898070047

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BEHRAVAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Behravan (CPSO#: 143677 )
Business Address: Grand Optima Medical Clinic 9055975125
Business Address: 1-87 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M2N 1M4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOOSHIN BEHRAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHRAVAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOOSHIN BEHRAVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEHRAVAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University Mashhad Branch Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2022