THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:01:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Outpatient and Community Services Centre
2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6345
Fax: 416-756-6727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 03 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lauren Borch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Borch (CPSO#: 143734 )
Business Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0K2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
Outpatient and Community Services Centre
2 Champagne Dr
North York ON M3J 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-756-6345
Fax: 416-756-6727

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 03 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lauren Borch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Borch (CPSO#: 143734 )
Business Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Toronto Ontario M3J 0K2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ANN BORCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ANN BORCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2022
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 13 Sep 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2022