THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 04:25:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Quaid-e-Azam Medical College, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1300 Garth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 4L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-326-1257
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 379 Saint Paul Avenue
Brantford Ontario N3R 4N5
Phone: (519) 512-0030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fida (CPSO#: 143833 )
Business Address: 1300 Garth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 4L7
2893261257

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Quaid-e-Azam Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1300 Garth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 4L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-326-1257
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 379 Saint Paul Avenue
Brantford Ontario N3R 4N5
Phone: (519) 512-0030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Fida (CPSO#: 143833 )
Business Address: 1300 Garth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 4L7
2893261257

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORINA FIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NORINA FIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FIDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Quaid-e-Azam Medical College, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2023