THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 Kensington Road
Suite 302
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057915246
Fax: 9057911250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Safwaan Suleman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Suleman (CPSO#: 143899 )
Business Address: 18 Kensington Road
Suite 302
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
9057915246

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 Kensington Road
Suite 302
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057915246
Fax: 9057911250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Safwaan Suleman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Suleman (CPSO#: 143899 )
Business Address: 18 Kensington Road
Suite 302
Brampton Ontario L6T 4S5
9057915246

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAFWAAN SULEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULEMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAFWAAN SULEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULEMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2024