THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: Nannuan, Amandeep Kaur (Used Until: 03 Sep 2022)
Medical School: Adesh Institute of Medical Sciences & Research, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1685 Bayview Ave
Bayside Medical Clinic
East York ON M4G 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-259-5112
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A CHERA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chera (CPSO#: 143941 )
Business Address: 1685 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3C1
647 259 5112

General Information

Former Name: Nannuan, Amandeep Kaur (Used Until: 03 Sep 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Adesh Institute of Medical Sciences & Research, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1685 Bayview Ave
Bayside Medical Clinic
East York ON M4G 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-259-5112
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A CHERA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chera (CPSO#: 143941 )
Business Address: 1685 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3C1
647 259 5112

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDEEP KAUR CHERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDEEP KAUR CHERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Adesh Institute of Medical Sciences & Research, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2022