THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:57:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: Arugu, Ekwani Ilaghisigh (Used Until: 04 Dec 2022)
Medical School: University of Port Harcourt College of Health Sciences, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Northfield Drive East
Phoenix Healthcare Centre
Unit 306
Waterloo Ontario N2K 3P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-279-1497
Fax: 519-279-9642

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Ekwani Solomon Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Solomon (CPSO#: 143965 )
Business Address: 99 Northfield Drive East
Phoenix Healthcare Centre
Unit 306
Waterloo Ontario N2K 3P9

General Information

Former Name: Arugu, Ekwani Ilaghisigh (Used Until: 04 Dec 2022)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Port Harcourt College of Health Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 99 Northfield Drive East
Phoenix Healthcare Centre
Unit 306
Waterloo Ontario N2K 3P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-279-1497
Fax: 519-279-9642

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Ekwani Solomon Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Solomon (CPSO#: 143965 )
Business Address: 99 Northfield Drive East
Phoenix Healthcare Centre
Unit 306
Waterloo Ontario N2K 3P9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EKWANI ILAGHISIGH SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EKWANI ILAGHISIGH SOLOMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLOMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Port Harcourt College of Health Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2023