THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:29:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: Zhang, YiXiao (Used Until: 11 Nov 2022)
Medical School: Meharry Medical College School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 262-5 Fairview Mall Dr
North York ON M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-698-8788
Fax: 416-698-0188

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zhang (CPSO#: 144140 )
Business Address: 39 Westlake Cres
East York ON M4C 2X3

General Information

Former Name: Zhang, YiXiao (Used Until: 11 Nov 2022)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Meharry Medical College School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 262-5 Fairview Mall Dr
North York ON M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-698-8788
Fax: 416-698-0188

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zhang (CPSO#: 144140 )
Business Address: 39 Westlake Cres
East York ON M4C 2X3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENNIS ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Meharry Medical College School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2022
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Dec 2022