THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: All Saints University School of Medicine, Dominica, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473445028
Fax: 6473489206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 11 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masuma Khawaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khawaja (CPSO#: 144287 )
Business Address: 2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2Z9
6473445028

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: All Saints University School of Medicine, Dominica, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6473445028
Fax: 6473489206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 11 Jul 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masuma Khawaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khawaja (CPSO#: 144287 )
Business Address: 2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2Z9
6473445028

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MASUMA KHAWAJA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and endocrinology and metabolism.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MASUMA KHAWAJA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and endocrinology and metabolism.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: All Saints University School of Medicine, Dominica, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Feb 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 10 Jul 2026