THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ritson North Medical Centre
9-1288 Ritson Rd N
Oshawa ON L1G 7Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR AL-KARAGHOOLI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Karaghooli (CPSO#: 144379 )
Business Address: 9-1288 Ritson Rd N
Oshawa ON L1G 7Z9
905-240-7662

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ritson North Medical Centre
9-1288 Ritson Rd N
Oshawa ON L1G 7Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR AL-KARAGHOOLI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al-Karaghooli (CPSO#: 144379 )
Business Address: 9-1288 Ritson Rd N
Oshawa ON L1G 7Z9
905-240-7662

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Dec 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 06 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MUSTAFA ATALLAH HASIN AL-KARAGHOOLI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MUSTAFA ATALLAH HASIN AL-KARAGHOOLI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Dec 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 16 Apr 2026