THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:41:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Capital Medical University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. A. BIHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bihi (CPSO#: 144921 )
Business Address: 354 Monticello Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2S 1B6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Capital Medical University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-80 Michael Cowpland Dr
Kanata ON K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 May 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. A. BIHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bihi (CPSO#: 144921 )
Business Address: 354 Monticello Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2S 1B6

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 17 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALI BIHI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ALI BIHI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Capital Medical University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 May 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 May 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 May 2023