THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:25:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Krishna Institute of Medical Sciences University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905.853.0404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K Bharati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bharati (CPSO#: 145663 )
Business Address: unit 102-17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4W4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Krishna Institute of Medical Sciences University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905.853.0404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jan 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K Bharati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bharati (CPSO#: 145663 )
Business Address: unit 102-17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 4W4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAVERI BHARATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARATI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAVERI BHARATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHARATI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Krishna Institute of Medical Sciences University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2023