THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:37:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 464 Welland Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 5V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056846388
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 02 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 464 Welland Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2M 5V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056846388
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 02 Jul 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Norfolk General Hospital
LOCATION: Simcoe

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Dec 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PATRICK CHUN YIN LAI may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. PATRICK CHUN YIN LAI may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 01 Jul 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2023