THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:03:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Medicine and Health Sciences, St. Kitts, 2019
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GOWRISHANKAR MANIMARAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Manimaran (CPSO#: 145743 )
Business Address: 1603 Blakely Drive
Cornwall Ontario K6J 5K5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Medicine and Health Sciences, St. Kitts, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Sep 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GOWRISHANKAR MANIMARAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Manimaran (CPSO#: 145743 )
Business Address: 1603 Blakely Drive
Cornwall Ontario K6J 5K5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 Sep 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 02 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. GOWRISHANKAR MANIMARAN may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. GOWRISHANKAR MANIMARAN may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Medicine and Health Sciences, St. Kitts, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2023