THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:03:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6M 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
Phone: 9053060097
Fax: 9052861135

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SATCHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Satchi (CPSO#: 145960 )
Business Address: 479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6M 1L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6M 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1100 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E7
Phone: 9053060097
Fax: 9052861135

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Apr 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SATCHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Satchi (CPSO#: 145960 )
Business Address: 479 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6M 1L9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 May 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 25 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAMANAN ROM SATCHI may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAMANAN ROM SATCHI may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 May 2023
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2023

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2023