THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:18:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SINDHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5L 6A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-607-6661
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prakash Motwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Motwani (CPSO#: 145971 )
Business Address: 6-2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5L 6A4
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SINDHI, URDU
Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6-2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5L 6A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-607-6661
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Feb 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 06 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prakash Motwani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Motwani (CPSO#: 145971 )
Business Address: 6-2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5L 6A4
Business Address: 101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 1R8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRAKASH MOTWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTWANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRAKASH MOTWANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOTWANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Matthew's University School of Medicine (Grand Cayman), 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2023