THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:46:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: Arabsolghar, mahnaz (Used Until: 17 Jan 2024)
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Azar Medical Clinic
267 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 992-9277
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. GHOMESHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CPRPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghomeshi (CPSO#: 146608 )
Business Address: 267 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1M8
647 992 9277

General Information

Former Name: Arabsolghar, mahnaz (Used Until: 17 Jan 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Azar Medical Clinic
267 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 992-9277
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. GHOMESHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CPRPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghomeshi (CPSO#: 146608 )
Business Address: 267 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1M8
647 992 9277

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHNAZ GHOMESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOMESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAHNAZ GHOMESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHOMESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 08 Jul 2027