Medical School:
University of Pretoria School of Medicine, 2014
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY |
DATE |
UNIVERSITY |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
01 Jul 2025 to 04 Aug 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
05 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
01 Aug 2024 to 04 Aug 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024 |
University of Toronto |
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology |
24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024 |
University of Toronto |
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology |
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023 |
University of Toronto |
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2025 to 04 Aug 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
05 Aug 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
01 Aug 2024 to 04 Aug 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2024 to 31 Jul 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
24 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY:
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE:
01 Jul 2023 to 22 Sep 2023
UNIVERSITY:
University of Toronto