THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:18:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Department Of Medical Imaging
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 03 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Engy Abbas Medicine professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Abbas (CPSO#: 146747 )
Business Address: 3156 Post Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 7C5
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 711 Concession Street
Juravinski Hospital
Department Of Medical Imaging
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 03 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Engy Abbas Medicine professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Abbas (CPSO#: 146747 )
Business Address: 3156 Post Road
Oakville Ontario L6H 7C5
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 Sep 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 03 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ENGY ALY ELSAYED ABBAS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, McMaster University, in which Dr. ABBAS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ABBAS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ABBAS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ABBAS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 03 September, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. ABBAS's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ENGY ALY ELSAYED ABBAS may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical Imaging, McMaster University, in which Dr. ABBAS holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ABBAS no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ABBAS’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ABBAS’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 03 September, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. ABBAS's academic appointment at McMaster University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023