THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:10:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-935 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-635-6060
Fax: 416-764-5620

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Radkhah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Radkhah (CPSO#: 146911 )
Business Address: 935 Sheppard Avenue West
No 1
Toronto Ontario M3H 2T7
4166356060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-935 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-635-6060
Fax: 416-764-5620

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Radkhah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Radkhah (CPSO#: 146911 )
Business Address: 935 Sheppard Avenue West
No 1
Toronto Ontario M3H 2T7
4166356060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEIVAN RADKHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADKHAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEIVAN RADKHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RADKHAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 15 Feb 2027