THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:59:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Gillingham Dr
Suite 200
Brampton ON L6X 0Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-451-1937
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia A. Hui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hui (CPSO#: 147160 )
Business Address: 200-60 Gillingham Dr
Brampton ON L6X 0Z9
905-451-1937

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Gillingham Dr
Suite 200
Brampton ON L6X 0Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-451-1937
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia A. Hui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hui (CPSO#: 147160 )
Business Address: 200-60 Gillingham Dr
Brampton ON L6X 0Z9
905-451-1937

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANNE HUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA ANNE HUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2023
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2023