THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:40:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 36 Queen Street E
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 36 Queen Street E
St. Michael's Hospital
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALY MEDHAT HALAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALAWA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SALY MEDHAT HALAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALAWA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Feb 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2023