THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:20:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-631 Queenston Rd
Hamilton ON L8K 6R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055600246
Fax: 9055605274
Address: 142 Minnesota Dr
Sir Thomas Roddick Hospital
Stephenville NL A2N 3X9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AL-KINANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Al-Kinani (CPSO#: 147373 )
Business Address: 631 Queenston Rd
Hamilton ON L8K 6R5
9055600246

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300-631 Queenston Rd
Hamilton ON L8K 6R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055600246
Fax: 9055605274
Address: 142 Minnesota Dr
Sir Thomas Roddick Hospital
Stephenville NL A2N 3X9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AL-KINANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Al-Kinani (CPSO#: 147373 )
Business Address: 631 Queenston Rd
Hamilton ON L8K 6R5
9055600246

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOSSRA ABDULSAHEB ABDULLAH AL-KINANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-KINANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOSSRA ABDULSAHEB ABDULLAH AL-KINANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-KINANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 27 Apr 2026